Financial history WHITBY AND DISTRICT LOBSTER POT NURSERY AND CRECHE LTD

Charity number: 1137831
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £118.78k £112.52k £108.62k £110.46k £90.80k
Total expenditure £98.00k £108.73k £124.38k £104.19k £101.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £44.06k £37.71k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £425 £0