POLASHY ASSOCIATION (PA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit and wellbeing of orphan's and children from extremely poor background in the UK, Bangladesh and other Commonwealth Nations without distinction of sex, race, or of political, religious or other opinions, in a common effort to advance the education, poverty relief, reduce suffering, safe guarding and to provide facilities for the interests of orphan's and poor children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 25 November 2010: Standard registration
- PA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANJUMA ARA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fatema Choudhury | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
NAZMA KHATUN | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suraya Dewan | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shanaz Hossain | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tyebunnesa Khatun | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS Hena Begum | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
RINA BEGUM | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAYMA BEGUM | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ayasha Koddus | Trustee | 24 November 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 May 2025 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 2 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE IN HABITANTS LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HACKNEY, REDBRIDGE, TOWER HAMLETS AND NEWHAM IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES WHO ARE IN HARDSHIP BY: A. RELIEVING POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE SAID INHABITANTS IN NEED OF SUCH ADVICE THAT MANY INCLUDE WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH AND EMPLOYMENT. B. ADVANCING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND OTHER SUBJECT CLASSES. C. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AMONGST PEOPLE OF MINORITY ETHNIC ORIGIN. D. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID IN HABITANTS HAVING NEED OF FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF HACKNEY, REDBRIDGE, TOWER HAMLETS AND NEWHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 CHELMSFORD ROAD
LONDON
E18 2PP
- Phone:
- 0 79 44622425
- Email:
- hbca@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window