THE UK ONCOLOGY NURSING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UK Oncology Nursing Society supports training, education and general support to cancer nurses across the 4 nations of the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
86 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 July 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 September 2013: Re-registered
- UKONS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr karen campbell | Chair | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Bryce | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jones | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Ewang | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Maynard | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Sherwood | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barry Gerard Quinn | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lyndel Moore | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI RUTH CLATWORTHY | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Ruth Louise Hammond | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Constance Elizabeth Rowell | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Wilson | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanne Bird | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Anne Tanay | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Foulkes | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.90k | £109.65k | £111.21k | £100.65k | £224.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.25k | £80.59k | £90.71k | £149.09k | £290.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 AUGUST 2009 as amended on 17 Nov 2018 as amended on 17 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1.1 TO ADVANCE HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CANCER; AND 1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF HEALTH, MEDICAL AND NURSING CARE, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE CAUSES, EFFECTS AND TREATMENTS OF CANCER.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
10 Queen Street Place
London
- Phone:
- 07974179262
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window