BRYNGOLWG FREE MISSION

Charity number: 1137468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our church supports Macmillan cancer support and local cancer support group Rowan Tree.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,156
Total expenditure: £7,129

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Rhondda Cynon Taff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John LEONARD Trustee
None on record
CLIVE BRYANT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.59k £6.09k £3.60k £12.92k £9.16k
Total expenditure £9.66k £3.26k £7.51k £17.33k £7.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 February 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DRILL HALL HOUSE
DYFFRYN ROAD
MOUNTAIN ASH
CF45 4DA
Phone:
01443478874
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available