HOME-START RICHMONDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Richmondshire offers emotional support and practical help to parents/carers that have at least one child less than seven years of age and are facing difficulties, through a network of highly trained volunteers supported by project co-ordinators. The geographical focus is Richmondshire district which includes Catterick Garrison.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather MacFarquhar | Chair | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rajina Thakali Rai | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Moore | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Anita Jay | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Terry | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tadeusz Zaranko | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie White | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Wykes | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.92k | £160.88k | £72.84k | £84.77k | £127.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.25k | £102.36k | £124.69k | £106.14k | £119.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS OR CARERS. B. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR PARENTS OR CARERS, TO HELP ENSURE THEIR CHILDREN GROW UP WITH EFFECTIVE CARE, WITHIN A SAFE AND STIMULATING ENVIRONMENT. C. TO ADVANCE AND DEVELOP THE SKILLS OF PARENTS OR CARERS, IN ORDER FOR THEM TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL STABILITY AND EFFECTIVE EMOTIONAL CARE FOR THEIR CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
RICHMONDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 4
Innovate
Chartermark Way
Colburn Business Park
CATTERICK GARRISON
DL9 4QJ
- Phone:
- 01748850079
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window