BLACKBURN ST LUKE, ST MARK & ST PHILIPS PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC is made up of 13 members and its role is to work with the vicar to promote the mission of the church in the parish, to care to people, to spread Christ's gospel of Good News and co-operating with other churches especially in our newly formed cluster of neighbouring churches. It takes decision by vote.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 11 November 2010: Previously excepted registration
- THE PARISH OF CHRIST THE KING BLACKBURN (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST THE KING BLACKBURN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jason Gardner | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan English | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Foot | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Mayoh | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thomas | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alan Gault | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Taylor | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Houghton | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE HOPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN MARGARET RYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILLIAN COOKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.76k | £17.21k | £92.96k | £206.38k | £208.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.16k | £31.68k | £63.72k | £137.31k | £334.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 04 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church
Bank Top
BLACKBURN
BB2 1TA
- Phone:
- 07816775916
- Email:
- hello@welcometostlukes.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window