PERU PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage a culture in North Peru where people living with disability are enabled to realise their full potential, being as independent as possible whilst also being seen and heard as equals within their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 15 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MYRTLE MARTIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hazel Delamere | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAY DADSWELL | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
BECCI AMOS | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN FISHER | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
NICOLAS PRENTICE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.14k | £18.61k | £23.85k | £53.42k | £34.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.96k | £21.94k | £17.08k | £22.63k | £66.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES IN PERU BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SERVICES AND TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF LOCAL PEOPLE AND ORGANISATIONS ASSISTING THESE DISABLED PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
PERU
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 Windmill Road
POLEGATE
East Sussex
BN26 5BQ
- Phone:
- 07983413631
- Email:
- MYRTLE_MARTIN54@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window