Governing document WOMANCARE GLOBAL INTERNATIONAL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/02/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE FOLLOWING: 1. TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION, UNDERTAKE RESEARCH, DISTRIBUTE MEDICINES AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD TO FACILITATE FAMILY PLANNING AND PROMOTE RESPONSIBLE PARENTHOOD INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) MATTERS OF FERTILITY AND PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND ITS EFFECTS ON WOMEN, WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL OR SOCIAL; 2.TO PROVIDE ADVICE, TREATMENT AND ASSISTANCE FOR WOMEN WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF FERTILITY OR INFERTILITY.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.