UNITED IN CANCER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness, in particular but not exclusively by: The provision of funds to carry out non-animal tested cancer research; The provision of grants and financial assistance for cancer related organisations including hospices and hospitals; The provision of grants and financial assistance, support and relief to cancer sufferers, their carers and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 October 2010: Standard registration
- 21 May 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- UNITED IN CANCER (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.95k | £42.29k | £39.69k | £34.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.89k | £43.73k | £35.57k | £42.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 30 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 28 April 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 02 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 02 April 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 25 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 25 April 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 10 May 2012 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 30 April 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO CARRY OUT NON ANIMAL TESTED CANCER RESEARCH. (II) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR CANCER RELATED ORGANIZATIONS INCLUDING HOSPICES AND HOSPITALS. (III) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND RELIEF TO CANCER SUFFERS, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window