SILVERHILL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income for the charity come from annual summer and Christmas fairs, regular discos for the children, ladies evenings and providing refreshments at sports days, open days and parents evenings. Expenditure includes refreshments, prizes, administration for the events listed above. Extra expenditure is then from what the school requires at the time including animal feed, and school resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Derby City
Governance
- 01 July 2010: Standard registration
- SILVERHILL PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Harrison | Chair | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Heaps | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Beesley | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.63k | £15.04k | £8.86k | £12.55k | £7.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.67k | £9.02k | £11.58k | £16.06k | £5.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 23 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JUNE 2010 as amended on 15 May 2020 as amended on 11 Nov 2021 as amended on 11 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Silverhill Primary School
Draycott Drive
Mickleover
DERBY
DE3 0QE
- Phone:
- 01332511138
- Email:
- silverhillptfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window