POSITIVE MENTAL ATTITUDE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with young people excluded from mainstream education and offer up to 5 GCSEs. We also offer adults a range of qualifications ranging from Entry Levels to Level 2, such as the Adult Literacy to both young and mature adults! Other exciting courses such as the Diploma in Sound & Music Technology are also among the options. For Private Candidates seeking to sit or resit Exams
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 27 July 2010: Standard registration
- 24 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION/TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE BOROUGH WIDE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window