MUSLIM INSTITUTE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To explore, debate and discuss the pressing intellectual problems and issues facing British Muslim communities and wider society; encourage and support the pursuit of excellence in knowledge and thought as an agent of positive change; and provide an intellectual space where problems and issues can be discussed from multiple perspectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Abida Malik | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shenaz Bunglawala | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sameera Hanif | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Shamim Miah | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Mahamdallie | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ASIM SIDDIQUI | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ZIAUDDIN SARDAR | Trustee |
|
||||||
MUFTI ABDUL KADIR BARKATULLA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.00k | £87.74k | £91.38k | £101.10k | £93.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.49k | £95.07k | £87.37k | £127.30k | £118.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MAY 2010 as amended on 26 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canopi
82 Tanner Street
London
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 07946431451
- Email:
- info@musliminstitute.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window