ZHEN QUAI TANG TRUE BUDDHA SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the principles and philosophies of Buddhism and to advance the Buddhist faith through teaching, study, practice and observance of the traditions of all schools of Buddhism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Stockport
- Warrington
Governance
- 18 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HON KEUN CHOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KWAI MING LI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANG YEE WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIN MAN FONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANG WAN CHOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YAU TAI CANDY YIM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.13k | £27.16k | £20.41k | £21.98k | £28.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.33k | £23.44k | £19.38k | £22.06k | £26.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2025 | 406 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2025 | 406 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 289 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/03/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PHILOSOPHIES OF BUDDHISM 2) TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST FAITH THROUGH TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND OBSERVANCE OF THE TRADITIONS OF ALL SCHOOLS OF BUDDHISM
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 WARWICK DRIVE
HAZEL GROVE
STOCKPORT
SK7 5LQ
- Phone:
- 07767323888
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window