Financial history BLOOM MICROVENTURES

Charity number: 1136785
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/06/2013 06/06/2014 06/06/2015 06/06/2016 06/06/2017
Total gross income £13.64k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £12.17k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0