KIDZ KONNEKT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kidz Konnekt acts as a resource for young people up to the age of 25 living in the North of England by providing advice and assistance and organizing programmes of physical, educational and other activities as a means of: a) Advancing in life and helping young people . b) Advancing education, c) Relieving unemployment, d) Providing recreational and leisure time activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,254 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Standard registration
- 20 March 2023: Funds received from 1167964 BLAZE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA LONSDALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Nigel Horne | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
KAREN MCGARRITY | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
IAN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.91k | £290.51k | £359.12k | £211.65k | £255.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.51k | £211.58k | £348.65k | £277.06k | £233.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £32.36k | £88.76k | £95.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.35k | N/A | £7.97k | £23.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGE 8 (EIGHT) YEARS UP TO THE AGE OF 25 (TWENTY-FIVE) YEARS OF AGE LIVING IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. (THE OBJECTS)
Area of benefit
REDCAR AND CLEVELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eston Leisure Centre
Normanby Road
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS6 9AE
- Phone:
- 01642442046
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window