Trustees THE UNIVERSITY OF NOTTINGHAM STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1136986

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob Michael Wedgbury | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Asher David Rose | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Batty | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Maynard | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Andrew Little | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nuriat Oluwa | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jiale Zhang | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Raj Chauhan | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain David Messore | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elanur Taylor | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clement Owusu Asante | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Miller | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Maina | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Edward Holmes | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prathu Prathu - | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Reynolds | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Bridge | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.