THE GURKHA MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain a permanent memorial to educate the public in the role of the Gurkhas in the town of Folkestone including remembrance services to acknowledge their role played in the community. To provide support for the Gurkha community in Folkestone & East Kent, and fund development and humanitarian work in Nepal in recognition of our gratitude for their contribution to the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 10 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DHAN GURUNG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gary Alan BAGSHAW | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne WILSON | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas William SPARKES | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Alan HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alka Gurung | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ray Douglas Johnson | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BARBER | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.22k | £1.85k | £4.70k | £6.23k | £4.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.65k | £4.47k | £4.88k | £1.48k | £7.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ERECT AND MAINTAIN A PERMANENT MEMORIAL TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ROLE OF THE GURKHAS IN THE TOWN OF FOLKESTONE INCLUDING REMEMBRANCE SERVICES TO ACKNOWLEDGE THEIR ROLE PLAYED IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
FOLKESTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
82, Ashley Avenue
FOLKESTONE
Kent
CT19 4PJ
- Phone:
- 07967345901
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window