Accounts and annual returns BISHOPSTOKE, FAIR OAK AND HORTON HEATH STREET, SCHOOL AND PRAYER PASTORS

Charity Number: 1137634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 01 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 March 2025 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required