PLYMOUTH ASPIRATIONS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We assist young people in Plymouth who have been recognised by a supporting organisation as having an aspiration to do higher and greater things, recognising their wider aspiration to include sporting, musical, artistic, vocational or academic. We want to help young people create amazing futures, by providing funding and support programmes that can help them develop their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 08 September 2010: Standard registration
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306804 THE ROYAL NAVAL AND MILITARY FREE SCHOOL PATRIOTIC...
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306803 THE ROYAL NAVAL AND MILITARY SCHOOLS ENDOWMENT
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306619 THE SKARDON BARRETT SCHOLARSHIP
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306618 ROWES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306620 THE D M L OAKLEY PRIZE
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306673 HOLMES AND CORRIE PRIZES FUND
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306689 WILLIAM LITTLETON PRIZE SCHEME
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306729-3 OLD SUTTONIANS WAR MEMORIAL PRIZE
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306678 GEORGE WILLIAM EYRE SCHOLARSHIP
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306732 STRIBLING PRIZE IN CONNECTION WITH VALLETORT COUNT...
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306690 COMPTON GIFFORD PRIZE
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306688 THE ASTOR ESSAY PRIZE
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306729-2 PHILIP EVELEIGH MEMORIAL PRIZE
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306772 ELIZE HELE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306686 HUBERT BRANSON SMITH BEQUEST
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306687 STEELE-PEARCE ENDOWMENTS
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306731 THE HEDLEY COOPER MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR TECHNICAL DRA...
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 810269 FOUNDER HEAD (GORDON MONK) PRIZE
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 280088 THE WESTLAKE PENCE
- 06 September 2011: Funds received from 306685 DEVONPORT SCHOLARSHIP FUND
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Turnock | Chair | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
FIONA PENDREIGH | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Juliette Morgan | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.36k | £4.81k | £5.55k | £9.66k | £8.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £200 | £1.49k | £6.63k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 AUGUST 2010 as amended on 07 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN PLYMOUTH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 1) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS OR SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC, OTHER ARTS OR SPORT) TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
PLYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Mutley Plain
PLYMOUTH
PL4 6JJ
- Phone:
- 07837053431
- Email:
- hello@imagineplymouth.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window