Financial history FURNITURELINK

Charity number: 1137021
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £196.96k £181.33k £236.35k £226.97k £236.74k
Total expenditure £206.38k £184.74k £218.27k £233.89k £246.92k
Income from government contracts £5.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £85.12k £5.15k N/A N/A