INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR PRISON STUDIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the charity are carried out under two broad headings, firstly that of Research and related matters and secondly that of working on a variety of. International Prison Reform Projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2014
Total income:
£529,129
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £524.07k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5.06k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£564,676
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £514.26k | |
Other | £20.55k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £50.41k | |
Charitable expenditure | £514.26k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- China
- Ethiopia
- Libya
- Peru
- Switzerland
Governance
- 08 July 2010: Standard registration
- 07 June 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 07 June 2016: Funds transferred to 1100866 THE INSTITUTE FOR CRIMINAL POLICY RESEARCH (ICPR)
- ICPS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08m | £604.81k | £855.81k | £529.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £497.93k | £607.52k | £857.37k | £564.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £660.73k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £414.50k | £597.79k | £848.31k | £524.07k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.18k | £7.02k | £7.50k | £5.06k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £451.39k | £559.62k | £806.23k | £514.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.57k | £18.82k | £17.78k | £17.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £10.95k | £17.52k | £19.99k | £20.55k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.78k | £5.68k | £2.59k | £1.16k | |
|
Long-term investments | £255.00k | £260.21k | £268.57k | £274.10k | |
|
Other assets | £354.63k | £384.87k | £343.68k | £284.57k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £33.62k | £69.67k | £35.31k | £15.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 21 January 2016 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | 22 July 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 31 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | 18 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 05 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | 02 July 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO FURTHER AND PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY UNDERTAKING OR ASSISTING IN THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE USE AND PRACTICE OF IMPRISONMENT IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS AND OUTCOMES OF SUCH RESEARCH AND TO USE IT TO ADVANCE COMPLIANCE WITH HUMAN RIGHTS STANDARDS.
Area of benefit
UK AND OVERSEAS,
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window