GOD'S CHANNEL CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Praying, Worshiping God and Church service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bexley
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHANIE OGEDEMGBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pastor Stephen Ogedengbe | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
OMOH KATE ETTI | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLUTOSIN ASHAJU | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2019 | 01/12/2020 | 01/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £9.50k | £8.70k | £11.80k | £9.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.99k | £9.50k | £8.70k | £12.40k | £11.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | 27 September 2022 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN BEXLEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LOVING IN BEXLEY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS AND SERVICES
Area of benefit
BEXLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BELLARMINE CLOSE
LONDON
SE28 0JG
- Phone:
- 07877428512
- Email:
- info_GCCC@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window