Financial history SHREWSBURY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 501082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £22.64k £9.32k £973 £14.05k £15.85k
Total expenditure £13.48k £7.19k £3.73k £17.09k £21.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A