MILELE SPONSORSHIP PROGRAMME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Milele is a small charity dedicated to enhancing educational opportunities for children in Kenya who need them the most. Milele is passionate about facilitating choice, to empower these children to take control of their own lives and destinies, and shape their own futures. Milele helps children in Kenya by providing access to education, food and healthcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
Governance
- 07 September 2010: Standard registration
- 23 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MILELE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.04k | £22.90k | £18.02k | £11.74k | £11.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.28k | £21.65k | £16.18k | £11.62k | £14.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 331 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 331 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 697 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 697 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN LIVING IN COAST PROVINCE, KENYA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MATERIALS AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND HEALTHCARE.
Area of benefit
KENYA,
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window