MAKE MY DAY BETTER LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the prevention or relief of poverty and the advancement of health or the saving of lives, the charity: funds research into complementary and alternative medicine, makes grants to individuals in cases of demonstrable hardship or need, supports education and makes grants to institutions and charities who are able to carry out activities that further the objects of Make My Day Better.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income:
£756,127
Donations and legacies | £756.13k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£963,057
Raising funds | £134 | |
Charitable activities | £962.92k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £134 | |
Charitable expenditure | £962.92k |
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cambodia
- India
- Kenya
- Mozambique
- Rwanda
- South Africa
Governance
- 29 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE BURROWES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER PHELPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.53k | £4.47k | £650.00k | £750.00k | £756.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £948.00k | £1.17m | £1.29m | £573.94k | £963.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £650.00k | £750.00k | £756.13k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.29m | £573.72k | £962.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £216 | £216 | £134 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £7.04k | £8.14k | £7.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £1.28m | £562.32k | £927.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £272.70k | £449.41k | £242.65k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £6.70k | £7.35k | £7.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 08 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED WITH COMPANIES HOUSE 23 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY MAKING GRANTS TOWARDS CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF COMPLEMENTARY AND ALTERNATIVE MEDICINES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS OBJECT 'COMPLEMENTARY AND ALTERNATIVE MEDICINES' IS DEFINED AS OSTEOPATHY, CHIROPRACTIC, ACUPUNCTURE, HERBAL MEDICINE, HOMEOPATHY AND ANY OTHER THERAPIES WHICH ARE ACCEPTED AS BEING EMBRACED BY THE FIRST AND SECOND GROUPS OF THERAPIES ORIGINALLY DEFINED BY THE HOUSE OF LORDS SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY COMMITTEE REPORT ON COMPLEMENTARY AND ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 QUEEN ELIZABETH STREET
LONDON
SE1 2BT
- Phone:
- 02079629966
- Email:
- JOHN@LOTUSGROUP.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window