Financial history BLUNTISHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1136939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £177.65k £185.30k £280.36k £187.20k £155.07k
Total expenditure £120.17k £127.31k £132.93k £417.14k £162.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A