Trustees BLUNTISHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1136939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jill Slater Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record
Lucy Thatcher Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Isabel Daniels Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
JANET HARRIS Trustee 12 September 2015
None on record
Katy Horrocks Trustee 14 January 2015
None on record
Peter Thatcher Trustee 26 April 2012
None on record
MALCOLM LEE Trustee
None on record