KING'S LYNN WORFOLK BOAT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KLWBT has professionally restored a 34ft fishing boat built by Walter Worfolk in King's Lynn in 1900, the Baden Powell. We use her to take groups of people on the River Great Ouse and into The Wash to tell them about wooden fishing boats, the lives of the fishermen of King's Lynn, the maritime history of the town and offer instruction in sailing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 January 2011: Standard registration
- SAVE THE BADEN POWELL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PAUL RAYMOND RICHARDS Mr | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KIM DAVID LEONARD | Trustee | 21 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Julie Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Hart | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM WOODFORD | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY PAUL CLAYTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRIS WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/06/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.23k | £10.52k | £18.92k | £10.33k | £5.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.95k | £16.37k | £15.88k | £12.77k | £8.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
TO RESTORE , PRESERVATION, OPERATION AND DISPLAY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE BADEN POWELL FISHING BOAT AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE LOCAL AREA, IN PARTICULAR THAT OF THE BADEN POWELL AND THE BOAT BUILDING INDUSTRY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SMITHFIELD COTTAGE
6 COTTAGE ROW
GAYTON ROAD
GAYWOOD
- Phone:
- 07985 673935
- Email:
- info@floatourboat.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window