THE CHANTRY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of rooms and facilities for local dramatic and musical groups, youth groups, pre-school activities and active recreation for elderly people, and people with learning difficulties as well as any other local community interest groups. Rooms are also available for private parties etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £9,690 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Judge | Chair | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Claire Griffiths | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Buckle | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tarquinia Mercedes Radclyffe | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Richard Raymond Telford | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|||||
GEOFF WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.58k | £101.03k | £98.55k | £191.71k | £99.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.14k | £61.31k | £89.15k | £86.72k | £106.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £44.34k | £9.83k | £74.24k | £9.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DURSLEY AND THOSE CIVIL PARISHES WHICH IMMEDIATELY ADJOIN THE PARISH OF DURSLEY (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, AGE, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, HEALTH AND AMATEUR SPORT AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE CHANTRY CENTRE LIMITED (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
DURSLEY AND THOSE CIVIL PARISHES WHICH IMMEDIATELY ADJOIN THE PARISH OF DURSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chantry Centre
34-36 Long Street
DURSLEY
GL11 4JB
- Phone:
- 03001023254
- Email:
- adrian@chantrycentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window