Financial history SALE WEST COMMUNITY URBAN TRUST

Charity number: 1137438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £27.43k £37.50k £35.67k £32.83k £33.51k
Total expenditure £32.86k £33.73k £36.42k £32.41k £40.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A £8.00k N/A N/A