STILL WATERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide subsidised Christian or secular counselling .To reach those in the community unable to afford or access other resources. To also provide CPD . Workshops:Child Protection/Safeguarding. Couple Counselling. Sand Tray Refresher
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 22 November 2010: Standard registration
- STILL WATERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Francis Leigh-Pemberton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Ann Woan | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mrs MaureenTeresa Francis | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alan Hudson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.27k | £72.78k | £78.72k | £84.20k | £95.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.04k | £50.53k | £74.73k | £100.62k | £82.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROVIDE HELP AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE WITHIN THE FOLLOWING GUIDELINES: A. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. B. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS AND PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH BY: I. THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO COUNSELLORS. STILL WATERS WILL OFFER FOR RENT THE TRAINING FACILITIES AT THE PROPERTY "49 GORDON ROAD, WESTWOOD, MARGATE, CT9 4EA" TO GROUPS INVOLVED IN CHRISTIAN MINISTRY, OR ANY OTHER SECULAR ACTIVITY THAT DOES NOT CONFLICT WITH THE CHRISTIAN ETHOS OF STILL WATERS. ANY POTENTIAL CONFLICT WILL BE ADDRESSED BY THE TRUSTEES AND THEIR WORD IS FINAL AND BINDING.
Area of benefit
MARGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
242 MARGATE ROAD
RAMSGATE
CT12 6AH
- Phone:
- 07768848045
- Website:
-
bystillwaters.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window