STOCKTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stockton Methodist Circuit comprises of 8 Methodist Churches in the area of Stockton on Tees, Yarm, Thornaby and Billingham. The churches hold services at various times on a Sunday and during the week to proclaim the love and compassion of Jesus Christ for all mankind. During the week the premises are used for various types of outreach for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

43 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 04 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
43 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Vincent Munyaradzi Jambawo | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
John Graham Monkhouse | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Caroline Noble | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olga Doreen Brand | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Toplis | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|||||
June Lesley Howard-Norman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Wilkinson | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leslie James Gilburt | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Charlotte Beer | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aneta Bradley | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Hazel Margaret Hall | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Bemrose | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rachel Louise Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Elliott Gowland | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Woodman | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Barton | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Ann Matthews | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Middleton | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Martin Ramsden | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM CLARKE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev SARAH RAMSDEN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MURRAY | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Pitt | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARY CARR | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
JUDITH LLOYD | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|||||
HOWARD LESLIE GILL | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|||||
MARK ANDREW HALL | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GREENHILL MOORE | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|||||
RHONA BALL | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER DODD PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DESMOND CHRISTOPHER KENDREW | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET WALTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN JOAN BURN BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BRIAN BAINBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHEILA ANNE HARGREAVES BA, PGCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
EDITH APPLEBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN MARY SHARP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLTON PETERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SMART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANN MORRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYNTHIA MARY DENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET SCHOFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £462.38k | £249.21k | £229.07k | £234.71k | £308.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £287.70k | £252.23k | £238.50k | £219.34k | £230.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Fritillary Place
Stockton-on-Tees
TS21 3LZ
- Phone:
- 01642602605
- Email:
- stocktonmc@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window