Trustees STOCKTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1137263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

43 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Vincent Munyaradzi Jambawo Chair 01 September 2021
NORTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
John Graham Monkhouse Trustee 01 September 2024
DARLINGTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Caroline Noble Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Olga Doreen Brand Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Paul Toplis Trustee 19 June 2023
YARM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
June Lesley Howard-Norman Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Sandra Wilkinson Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Leslie James Gilburt Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Abigail Charlotte Beer Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Aneta Bradley Trustee 28 November 2021
NORTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AIDAN AND ST COLUMBA, HARTLEPOOL
Received: On time
Hazel Margaret Hall Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Catherine Elizabeth Bemrose Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Rev Rachel Louise Williams Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Maureen Elliott Gowland Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Robert Woodman Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
Ralph Barton Trustee 16 February 2017
None on record
Rosalind Ann Matthews Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Eileen Middleton Trustee 15 September 2015
None on record
Rev Martin Ramsden Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
GRAHAM CLARKE Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record