Financial history MY SISTER'S PLACE

Charity Number: 1137319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £903.60k £1.15m £1.27m £1.22m £1.32m
Total expenditure £872.55k £1.05m £1.12m £1.26m £1.37m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £281.23k £882.44k £770.80k
Income from government grants £361.65k £255.21k £94.17k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £47.76k £157.04k £56.06k £79.78k £68.88k
Income - Other trading activities £82.49k £89.99k £82.72k £54.17k £73.50k
Income - Charitable activities £772.48k £903.54k £1.13m £1.09m £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £868 £432 £302 £298 £2.92k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £837.92k £975.40k £1.08m £1.26m £1.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.64k £76.24k £37.15k £75 £7.39k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.55k £16.74k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0