THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Luke's offers a variety of services each week and at other times during the year to meet the needs of the church and the wider community. Regular all age services attract those less comfortable with more formal services. A mid-week liturgical service draws increased numbers. Throughout the liturgical year we continue to attract the community at large by having a number of additional services,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,415 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST LUKE'S PCC, BRICKET WOOD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald Phelvin | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gibson | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dunster | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Plummer | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott Burke | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Lynne HERBERT | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judy Blamey | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Marie Cook | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA FUNNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.74k | £107.72k | £104.02k | £125.61k | £115.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.56k | £92.52k | £108.52k | £170.25k | £128.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.58k | N/A | £135 | £1.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. LUKES CHURCH OFFICE
THE CRESCENT
BRICKET WOOD
ST. ALBANS
AL2 3NF
- Phone:
- 01923676401
- Email:
- office@st-lukes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window