JOBS FOR LIFE LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The current activities are limited whilst the trustees consider how it can raise funds to meet its objectives. The revenue generating operating plan at the commencement of the charity had to be aborted due to changes in legislation beyond the control of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 January 2011: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £187 | £1.39k | £180 | £219 | £180 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 28 March 2018 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 18 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE VOCATIONAL TRAINING, TO THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE UNDER 18, THROUGH STRUCTURED COURSES, PROGRAMMES AND ACTIVITIES AND AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TO THOSE UNDERTAKING EDUCATION OR VOCATIONAL TRAINING. TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS OR ANY COMPANY OR OTHER BODY THAT PROMOTES OR UNDERTAKES THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND/OR VOCATIONAL TRAINING.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window