Governing document Ocean Generation

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ENTERED ON COMPANIES REGISTER 8 FEBRUARY 2011 as amended on 27 Jan 2021 as amended on 27 Apr 2021 as amended on 24 May 2021 as amended on 26 Jul 2021 as amended on 14 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
2.1 The Charity’s objects (“Objects”) are specifically restricted to the promotion for the public benefit of the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment, in particular but not exclusively by: 2.1.1 promoting the restoration of a healthy connection between humanity and the ocean; 2.1.2 raising public awareness of the problem of man-made waste in the environment, including the public health implications and the impact of associated environmental toxins; and 2.1.3 the identification and support of environmental solutions aimed at reducing the level and impact of plastic pollution on the environment and public health.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.