THE CIVIL SERVICE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides grants in money or kind, either directly or to an organisation that will provide relief from suffering, hardship or distress, financial or otherwise. The Charity's prime beneficiaries are Civil Servants, former Civil Servants, Public Body Employees or former Public Body Employees, and their dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,416,000
Donations and legacies | £3.80m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £467.00k | |
Other | £151.00k |
Total expenditure:
£8,005,000
Raising funds | £1.31m | |
Charitable activities | £6.69m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,765,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £135,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.31m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.69m |
People

92 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
353 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 July 2010: Standard registration
- 04 October 2019: Funds received from 225008 THE NORTH WEST CUSTOMS AND EXCISE BENEVOLENT SOCIE...
- THE CHARITY FOR CIVIL SERVANTS (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alban Stowe | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela MACDONALD | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke John Treadwell | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Nicholas Kuenssberg | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jaspal Roopra | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jonathan Smith | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Clare Phippard | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Brook | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Renwick | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clara Lane | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Schofield | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mal Singh | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.11m | £5.33m | £4.79m | £5.14m | £4.42m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.65m | £8.19m | £7.94m | £8.55m | £8.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £152.00k | £152.00k | £196.00k | £753.00k | £135.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.27m | £4.56m | £4.45m | £4.76m | £3.80m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £814.00k | £603.00k | £300.00k | £345.00k | £467.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £24.00k | £165.00k | £37.00k | £8.00k | £151.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £278.00k | £99.00k | £324.00k | £372.00k | £280.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.13m | £6.77m | £6.29m | £7.13m | £6.69m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.52m | £1.42m | £1.65m | £1.42m | £1.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £40.00k | £32.00k | £34.00k | £35.00k | £33.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £130.00k | £113.00k | £91.00k | £95.00k | £89.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £789.00k | £960.00k | £1.20m | £1.28m | £963.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £39.10m | £35.53m | £32.59m | £25.80m | £25.84m | |
|
Other assets | £1.25m | £1.69m | £1.79m | £1.89m | £733.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£338.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £588.00k | £578.00k | £679.00k | £582.00k | £402.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JUNE 2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/03/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/05/2015 as amended on 28 Jan 2020 as amended on 22 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
For the public benefit, to relieve from suffering, hardship or distress (whether financial or otherwise), and to promote and sustain the wellbeing of Civil Servants, former Civil Servants, Public Body Employees or former Public Body Employees, employees and former employees of the Charity (and any predecessor organisation of it) and their dependants including without limitation by: i. offering lifelong practical, financial and emotional support, advice and guidance; ii. providing direct support to individuals, using other available channels to enable civil service communities to connect and support each other, and collaborating with other organisations.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIVIL SERVICE BENEVOLENT FUND
FUND HOUSE
5 ANNE BOLEYNS WALK
SUTTON
SURREY
SM3 8DY
- Phone:
- 08000562424
- Email:
- hello@cfcs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window