HOLMFIRTH ART & MUSIC LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the Arts, by (a) producing an annual Festival (b) providing information about artistic activity in Holmfirth and the Holme Valley (c) providing support to local arts organisations in Holmfirth and the Holme Valley (d) acting as an informal conduit between Kirklees and Arts organisations in the Holme Valley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £7,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 27 April 2011: Standard registration
- HOLMFIRTH ART & MUSIC / HOLMFIRTH ARTS FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helena Elizabeth Sydor Lyons | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Gunning | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steve Wright | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ansell | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Amanda Jane Crowther | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Massett | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Kate Buchanan | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mason-Dixon | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Lawson | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Mary Bradley | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.99k | £63.35k | £68.28k | £83.40k | £102.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.00k | £46.06k | £70.38k | £71.54k | £97.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.32k | £4.68k | £7.00k | £10.92k | £7.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/03/2011 as amended on 07 Jan 2022 as amended on 17 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A) THE PRODUCTION OF AN ANNUAL ARTS FESTIVAL B) PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT ARTISTIC ACTIVITY IN HOLMFIRTH AND THE HOLME VALLEY C) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO LOCAL ARTS ORGANISATIONS IN HOLMFIRTH AND THE HOLME VALLEY D) ACTING AS AN INFORMAL CONDUIT BETWEEN KIRKLEES AND THE VARIOUS ARTS ORGANISATIONS IN THE HOLME VALLEY"
Area of benefit
HOLME VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Fair Trader Co-Operative
32 Huddersfield Road
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 2JS
- Phone:
- 01484686613
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window