PAPILLON RESCUE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rescue, rehabilitatioin and re-homing of papillons and phalenes who, through various circumstances, find themselves in need of a new home. Fund raising activities such as, training days, fun days, companion dog shows, charity`s stand at various events and and car boots.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Standard registration
- PRUK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanette Maggs | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keavy McGrath | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Goodwin | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Hobson | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matt Valentine | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09k | £4.05k | £5.43k | £2.85k | £5.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £3.43k | £5.18k | £3.38k | £7.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 December 2023 | 413 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF PAPILLON DOGS IN NEED OF CARE, ATTENTION, REHOMING AS A RESULT OF ILL TREATMENT, HARDSHIP, NEGLECT OR CHANGE OF CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Heath End Road
BEXLEY
DA5 2AH
- Phone:
- 07745093735
- Email:
- jeanette.magg@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window