Trustees JOHN DONNE PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA
Charity Number: 1137009

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giovanna Ziccardi | Chair | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Carroll | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Harper | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Fairey | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lian Watson | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Qui Mai Morgan | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Walker | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Burgoyne | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ekta Sharma | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Frusciante | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Calista Fox | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Marie Reynolds | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Bradbury | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elissa Turnbull | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.