THE MAYOR OF MILTON KEYNES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 2012/13 the Mayor's charity raised ?4,102.50 for Milton Keynes Dons Sport and Education Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 31 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Deacon | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.22k | £3.94k | £1.11k | £2.62k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.94k | £1.11k | £2.62k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 27 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES (WHICH SHALL BE NON-PARTY AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION) OR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PROJECTS WHICH THE TRUSTEES DEEM WORTHY. 2. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIVIC OFFICES
1 SAXON GATE EAST
MILTON KEYNES
MK9 3HG
- Phone:
- 01908253601
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window