Accounts and annual returns VICTORY LODGE NUMBER 4042 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 501103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 January 2024 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 08 January 2023 07 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 08 January 2022 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 08 January 2021 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 08 January 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2020 Not Required