FRIENDS OF BUNNY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1138440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL FUNDS THIS YEAR WERE RAISED BY A NUMBER OF EVENTS INCLUDING SUMMER FAYRES, CAKE SALES, SPRING CRAFTS, FOOTBALL TOURNAMNET AND QUIZ NIGHT. MONEY HAS BEEN SPENT ON IT EQUIPMENT, SPORTS EQUIPMENT, LEAVERS BOOK, RESIDENTIAL TRIPS AND PANTOMIME TRIPS AS WELL AS A FEW SMALLER PROJECTS FOR THE SCHOOL AND LOCAL COMMUNITY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £6,598
Total expenditure: £10,222

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2010: Standard registration
  • 06 March 2025: Funds received from 1036619 BUNNY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Neve Chair 05 October 2023
None on record
Lucy Perrow Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
James Offer Trustee 09 September 2022
None on record
Victoria White Trustee 09 September 2022
None on record
Catriona Hind Trustee 11 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.17k £5.32k £10.58k £9.03k £6.60k
Total expenditure £3.03k £5.67k £6.85k £7.20k £10.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 01 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BUNNY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
CHURCH STREET
BUNNY
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 6QW
Phone:
01159212727