Accounts and annual returns BIRMINGHAM CHILD CONTACT CENTRE

Charity number: 1141692
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 07 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 01 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 01 February 2016 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2014 06 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2013 07 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required