HANFI SUNNI MUSLIM CIRCLE- RAZA MASJID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the association are to promote the advancement of the religion in accordance with doctrines of Islam and the Fiqh-i-Hanfi, to advance education in accordance with the Islamic beliefs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 03 November 2010: Standard registration
- RAZA MOSQUE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Azhar Mahmood | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Akeel Dad | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zahid Zafar | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Waseem Younus | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
NAWAZ MOHAMMED | Trustee | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.67k | £87.07k | £71.07k | £114.48k | £114.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.15k | £71.07k | £79.90k | £75.96k | £75.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
18 February 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2022
(These accounts |
09 May 2023 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 479 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 479 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF ISLAM AND THE FIQH-I-HANFI (BRAILVI), TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ISLAMIC BELIEFS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 ST. PAULS AVENUE
PRESTON
PR1 1QH
- Phone:
- 07504795817
- Email:
- razamosque786@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window