BITE-BACK SHARK & MARINE CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bite-Back Shark & Marine Conservation is the charity dedicated to making Britain's restaurants and retailers shark-free. It successfully campaigns to end the sale of shark fin soup and other shark-derived products along with marine life at threat from over-fishing. It also operates campaigns to end the personal importation of shark fins and encourage the accurate reporting of sharks in the media.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 September 2010: Standard registration
- 12 November 2024: Funds received from 1139049 THE DIVING CHAMBER TREATMENT TRUST
- BITE-BACK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Ecott | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL STEPHEN | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIM BARKEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.64k | £42.53k | £43.22k | £46.35k | £36.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.60k | £38.29k | £40.57k | £40.02k | £63.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF THREATENED MARINE SPECIES AND OF THE WIDER MARINE ENVIRONMENT. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THREATENED MARINE SPECIES AND OF THE WIDER MARINE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 PIPER ROAD
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT1 3EX
- Phone:
- 02082413283
- Email:
- info@bite-back.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window