Accounts and annual returns MUSICAL THEATRE STAFFORD

Charity Number: 501105
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 June 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 02 June 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 02 June 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 02 June 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 02 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 02 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 02 June 2021 02 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 June 2020 04 May 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 June 2020 04 May 2021 32 days late