Financial history HOPE ALIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1137826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £65.42k £46.47k £42.98k £54.26k £71.03k
Total expenditure £53.88k £24.11k £36.44k £55.44k £67.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A