SOUTHAMPTON STREET PASTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide patrols of trained volunteers to give reassurance, safety & support through listening, caring and helping on the streets of Southampton. We work in the NTE, Schools, Community in partnership with police, council & others. We began in 2009 working nights in the city centre, in 2012 we expanded to work in schools patrolling as pupils leave and into the community in the early evening.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £39,569 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
148 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southampton City
Governance
- 03 September 2010: Standard registration
- 05 July 2024: Funds received from 1137316 EALING STREET PASTORS INITIATIVE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael David Sarson | Chair | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEITH POWERS | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Orton | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marian Elizabeth Astley Weston | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trevor James Edwards | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.29k | £91.63k | £107.31k | £104.16k | £135.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.99k | £92.84k | £97.12k | £97.58k | £121.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.57k | £39.57k | £65.07k | £39.57k | £39.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 9 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN SOUTHAMPTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SOUTHAMPTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SOUTHAMPTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF CARING, LISTENING AND HELPING PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND AT VARIOUS VENUES DAY AND NIGHT.
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 35
St Mary's Fire Station
St. Mary's Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 0BJ
- Phone:
- 02380333387
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window